IL HB0053 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Requires manufacturers of brand name or generic prescription drugs to notify State purchasers, health insurers, health care service plan providers, pharmacy benefit managers, and the General Assembly of specified increases in drug prices at least 60 days before such increase and the cost of specified new prescription drugs within 3 days after approval by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Provides that within 30 days after such notifications, prescription drug manufacturers shall report specified information to State purchasers, health insurers, health care service plan providers, pharmacy benefit managers, and the General Assembly. Provides that failure to report such information shall result in a specified civil penalty. Requires the General Assembly to conduct an annual public hearing on aggregate trends in prescription drug pricing. Provides that if the manufacturer of a prescription drug or its agent meets or otherwise communicates with a prescriber for the purpose of marketing a drug, then the manufacturer or its agent shall disclose to the prescriber if any ingredient in the drug it is marketing is known to pose a risk of dependency in humans. Makes other changes.
Title
DRUG MANUFACTURER-DISCLOSURES
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-07 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 620 | 16.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 620 | 16.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |