IL HB0223 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10,000,000, or so much of that amount as may be necessary, from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Public Health for grants and other expenses for the prevention and treatment of HIV/AIDS and the creation of an HIV/AIDS service delivery system. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$DPH-HIV/AIDS TREATMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | To Special Issues (AP) Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=223&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB0223.pdf |