IL HB0447 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code, Labor and Storage Lien Act, Labor and Storage Lien (Small Amount) Act, and Sale of Unclaimed Property Act to provide a process of providing notice to motor vehicle owners and lienholders prior to auction sale or impoundment. Provides that a towing service or person seeking to foreclose on a lien must contact the Secretary of State and request that the Secretary search the vehicle registration records of the State of Illinois for information relating to the owner of the vehicle and lienholders of record. Provides that in event the Secretary of State does not find any record of the motor vehicle, the towing service or person seeking to foreclose on a lien must search a national vehicle record information service and search the vehicle for any evidence relating to an owner or lienholder. Provides that any owner or lienholder identified by the procedures in this Act must be given notice of the motor vehicle impoundment or auction sale. Provides that the failure to perform the procedures in this Act will render any subsequent sale voidable by a court of competent jurisdiction. Reorganizes a provision of the Illinois Vehicle Code relating to record searches by deleting and adding the same language in different locations. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR VEHICLE RECORD SEARCHES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul D. Froehlich |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=447&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0447.htm |