IL HB0447 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police, Chicago Police, Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF), Chicago Municipal, Cook County, State Employee, and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that for a person who first becomes a police officer on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, none of the benefits provided in those Articles shall be paid to any person who is convicted of a felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with his or her service as a police officer or a disqualifying offense. Provides that with respect to benefits attributable to a police officer who first becomes a police officer on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, none of the benefits provided for in those Articles shall be paid to any police officer who otherwise would receive a survivor benefit who is convicted of a felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with his or her service as a police officer or a disqualifying offense. Defines "disqualifying offense" and "police officer". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-FELONY FORFEITURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-187 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-147 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |