IL HB0820 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0509
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0509
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Military Code of Illinois. Provides for the Adjutant General (i) to order Illinois National Guard personnel into active service for certain nonemergency functions and (ii) to make rules concerning military installations in conformity with federal rules. Provides for personnel to receive medical and dental treatment for injuries incurred "while on duty and lawfully performing the same" and to be treated for injuries, wounds, and disabilities at the nearest appropriate medical facility if a medical officer is not detailed. Provides for payment of medical treatment by the State.
Title
MILITARY CODE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0509 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-18 | First Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-17 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-20 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman |