IL HB0937 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-03 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-03 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the LIHEAP Summer Cooling Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that moneys in the Fund may be used, subject to appropriation, only by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services for the purposes of the LIHEAP Summer Cooling Program. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Requires the Department of Revenue to pay into the LIHEAP Summer Cooling Program Fund 100% of the net revenue realized for the preceding month from the 6.25% rate on the selling price of motor fuel and gasohol. Requires that these payments begin on the first month following the effective date of this amendatory Act and continue until the aggregate amount paid into that Fund under the Acts is $20,000,000. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-PROCEEDS-FUEL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-03 | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-03 | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-26 | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=937&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0937.htm |