IL HB1141 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act and the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, from each income tax payment that the Department of Revenue receives, the Department must deposit certain amounts directly into the Local Government Distributive Fund (currently, the Department deposits the tax payment into the General Revenue Fund and the Treasurer then transfers a percentage of the net revenue to the Local Government Distributive Fund). Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV DIST FUND DEPOSIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1141&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1141.htm |