IL HB1175 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Sprinkler Contractor Licensing Act. In a provision concerning inspections of existing fire sprinkler systems and control equipment, provides that a copy of the inspection report must be forwarded to the local fire department or fire protection district in which the sprinkler system is located. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
FIRE SPRINKLER LICENSING ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0256 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-08 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Licensed Activities | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2009-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-04-30 | Held in Licensed Activities | |
2009-04-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |