IL HB1244 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and the State Finance Act. Provides for the issuance of Choose Life license plates. Provides that, in addition to the appropriate registration fees, an applicant for the special plate shall be charged a fee of $25 at original issuance and $25 at renewal. Provides that $15 of the original issuance fee and $2 of the renewal fee shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that $10 of the additional original issuance fee and $23 of the renewal fee shall be deposited into the Choose Life Fund, a new special fund in the State treasury. Provides that all money in the Choose Life Fund shall be distributed in accordance with a specified formula to all applying qualified non-governmental, not-for-profit agencies whose services include counseling and meeting the material needs of pregnant women who are planning to place their children for adoption and contains other provisions regarding the distribution of money from the Choose Life Fund.
Title
VEH CD-CHOOSE LIFE PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.826 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1244&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1244.htm |