IL HB1409 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act. Changes the definition of resident to mean a person who meets the residency requirements as defined in the provision concerning residence of the Illinois Public Aid Code (instead of an individual (i) who is in the State for other than a temporary or transitory purpose during the taxable year or (ii) who is domiciled in the State but is absent from the State for a temporary or transitory purpose during the taxable year).
Title
ALL KIDS - RESIDENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-02-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 170 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |