IL HB1479 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that an employer may enter into an agreement with a community college in the State to establish a project. Provides that the term "project" means a program established by the community college to provide certain job training services. Provides that the employer is entitled to a credit against withholding tax payments in an amount equal to 1.5% of the wages paid by the employer to a participating employee during the first year of the employee's participation in the program. Provides that the employer shall remit the amount of the credit to the community college. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-JOB TRAINING CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Sen. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 704A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1479&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1479.htm |