IL HB1921 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Estate and Generation-Skipping Transfer Tax Act. Provides that no tax shall be imposed under the Act for persons dying on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act or for transfers made on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
ESTATE TAX-REPEAL
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 405 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 405 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 405 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1921&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1921.htm |