IL HB2539 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the threshold amount of the property that was the subject of the theft must exceed $2,000 (rather than $300) in order to enhance the penalty for retail theft from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class 4 felony or to a higher class of felony. Deletes enhancement of the penalties for retail theft for previous convictions for robbery, armed robbery, burglary, residential burglary, possession of burglary tools, home invasion, unlawful use of a credit card, or forgery.
Title
CRIM CD-RETAIL THEFT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2539&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2539.htm |