IL HB2559 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that sales of electricity, natural or artificial gas, and water are not subject to the taxes imposed under the Acts. Provides that a manufacturing exemption under the Acts does not apply to machinery and equipment used in (i) the generation of electricity for wholesale or retail sale; (ii) the generation or treatment of natural or artificial gas for wholesale or retail sale that is delivered to customers though pipes, pipelines, or mains; and (iii) the treatment of water for wholesale or retail sale that is delivered to customers though pipes, pipelines, or mains.
Title
USE/OCC-ELECTRICITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 1d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2559&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2559.htm |