IL HB2559 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the End Aldermanic Privilege Law in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, in the City of Chicago, a property owner, or a developer or contractor having the written permission of the property owner, shall not have any approvals denied because of an aldermanic hold, objection, extra-judicial or extra-legal request, or for any law or ordinance enacted or adopted after the date on which the property owner, developer, or contractor: (1) participated in a concept meeting for construction with representatives from the City of Chicago regarding the subject property; (2) filed a building permit application with the City of Chicago for the subject property; (3) presented a proposed development plan to a city council for the subject property; (4) substantially invested resources in the preparation of building plans, concept drawings, or securing building contracts for a preceding period of one year for the subject property; or (5) otherwise gave sufficient notice of an intent to develop to the pertinent regulatory authorities for the subject property. Allows suit against the State or the City of Chicago that seeks to enforce or impose a more restrictive law, regulation, ordinance, or resolution against the property owner, developer, or contractor and allows for a $5,000 civil penalty and other damages if the property owner's, developer's, or contractor's claim is successful. Limits home rule powers.
Title
END ALDERMANIC PRIVILEGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2022-03-04 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-17 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-17 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 009-001-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-13-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2559&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2559.htm |