IL HB2773 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Authority Act, the Illinois Sports Facilities Authority Act, and the Downstate Illinois Sports Facilities Authority Act. Provides that no tax is imposed under the Acts on the renting, leasing, or letting of hotel rooms to the American Red Cross for the provision or coordination of disaster relief services. Effective immediately.
Title
HOTEL TAX-RED CROSS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 145 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 210 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3205 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3210 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2773&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2773.htm |