IL HB2912 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the School Bus On-The-Shoulder Pilot Program Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall create a 5-year pilot program, in cooperation with the State Police, for the operation of school buses on the shoulder of State highways for the transportation of students to and from school-related events. The Secretary shall coordinate with the Department of Transportation in developing the rules of the program. Two years after the start of the program, the Secretary shall file a report with the General Assembly that details the program's findings. Repeals Act on December 31, 2022. Effective Immediately.
Title
SCHOOL BUS SHOULDER-PILOT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |