IL HB2915 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that in any 12-month period the Governor shall have the authority to issue only one proclamation per disaster and that any further proclamation for the disaster that triggered the original proclamation shall be in force only after a two-thirds vote of each chamber of the General Assembly approves a joint resolution containing the exact language of the proclamation and which the Governor must follow. Provides that the Governor shall have no authority to amend or change the language of the proclamation as approved by joint resolution.
Title
IEMA-DISASTER PROCLAMATION
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-09-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-09-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2915&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2915.htm |