IL HB2967 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Telephone System Act. Provides that each telecommunications carrier shall impose a monthly surcharge of $1.30 (rather than $0.87) per network connection; provided, however, the monthly surcharge shall not apply to a network connection provided for use with pay telephone services. Provides that each wireless carrier shall impose and collect a monthly surcharge of $1.30 (rather than $0.87) per CMRS connection that either has a telephone number within an area code assigned to Illinois by the North American Numbering Plan Administrator or has a billing address in this State. Provides that at least $0.87 of this surcharge per network or CMRS connection shall be deposited into the Statewide 9-1-1 Fund for distribution to local Emergency Telephone System Boards. Provides that grants shall be distributed on a per capita basis, with priority to Emergency Telephone System Boards that received a disproportionately large number of ambulance or emergency medical service dispatch 9-1-1 calls based on the population served by the Board. Provides that data on 9-1-1 calls collected annually by the Department of State Police shall be used to determine priority of grant distributions. Extends the repeal date of the Act until July 1, 2022 (rather than July 1, 2017). Effective immediately.
Title
EMERGENCY TELEPHONE SYS-GRANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 750 | 15.4b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 750 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 750 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 750 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2967&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2967.htm |