IL HB3134 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois in the provision concerning advance directive information. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall publish the Department of Public Health Uniform DNR Advance Directive form in Spanish and that the form shall meet the minimum requirements to nationally be considered a physician orders for life-sustaining treatment form. Makes other changes.
Title
DPH-ADVANCE DIRECTIVE INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0382 |
2011-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2011 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-001 |
2011-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |