IL HB3134 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the disabled veterans standard homestead exemption, provides that, for taxable years 2013 and thereafter, if the veteran has a service connected disability of 30% or more, then the property is exempt from taxation under the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-DISABLED VETERANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2014-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2014-07-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2014-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-02-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-01-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2013-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3134&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3134.htm |