IL HB3322 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Allows a motion to be filed with the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction in a defendant's case at any time following the entry of a guilty verdict or a finding of guilt for any offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance by the defendant provided: (1) the motion clearly states the penalty for the offense for which the defendant was found guilty or convicted has been amended or changed and became effective after his or her plea of guilty or conviction, which includes but is not limited to: (A) reduces the minimum or maximum sentence for the offense; (B) grants the court more discretion over the range of penalties for the offense; (C) the underlying conduct relating to the offense was decriminalized; or (D) other instances in which the penalties associated with the offense or conduct underlying the offense were reduced in any way; and (2) reasonable notice of the motion is served upon the State. If the court grants a motion under this Section, it must reduce the penalty imposed on the defendant so that it is consistent with the penalty the defendant would have received if the current law was in effect on the date when the offense was committed and the court may take any additional action it deems appropriate under the circumstances.
Title
CRIM PRO - RESENTENCE
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-006-000 |
2015-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-03-10 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3322&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3322.htm |