IL HB3322 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Professional Land Surveyor Act of 1989. Changes references to "Land Surveyor-in-Training" to references to "Surveyor Intern" and makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, including the definition of the practice of land surveying. Sets forth minimum standards to qualify for enrollment as a Surveyor Intern (rather than to apply for examination as a Land Surveyor-in-Training). Provides that the license for a Surveyor Intern does not expire. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to include email addresses in its roster of licenses. Allows a Professional Land Surveyor to administer and certify oaths for certain testimony. Makes other changes.
Title
LAND SURVEYOR-SURVEYOR INTERN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0171 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 330 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 330 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |