IL HB3561 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Provides that except in the case of a medical emergency, no physician or person shall knowingly perform, induce, or attempt to perform an abortion upon a pregnant woman when the probable gestational age of her unborn child has been determined to be at least 20 weeks. Provides that a woman upon whom an abortion in violation of the Act is performed or induced may not be prosecuted under the Act for a conspiracy to violate the 20 week requirement. Provides that the woman, the father of the unborn child if married to the mother at the time she receives an abortion in violation of the Act, or, if the mother has not attained the age of 18 years at the time of the abortion, or both, the maternal grandparents of the unborn child, may in a civil action obtain appropriate relief, unless the pregnancy resulted from the plaintiff's criminal conduct or, if brought by the maternal grandparents, the maternal grandparents consented to the abortion. Provides that a medical facility licensed under the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act or the Hospital Licensing Act in which an abortion is performed or induced in violation of the Act shall be subject to immediate revocation of its license by the Department of Public Health. Provides that a medical facility licensed under the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act or the Hospital Licensing Act in which an abortion is performed or induced in violation of the Act shall lose all State funding for 2 years and shall reimburse the State for moneys or grants received from the State by the medical facility for the fiscal year in which the abortion in violation of the Act was performed.
Title
ABORTION LAW-UNDER 20 WEEKS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Informed Consent Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 510 | 1.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 510 | 1.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 510 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 510 | 11.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 510 | 11.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 510 | 11.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 510 | 11.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 510 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 510 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 510 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3561&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3561.htm |