IL HB3658 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Aquaculture Development Act. Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Illinois Municipal Code, the Illinois Pesticide Act, the Agricultural Areas Conservation and Protection Act, the County Cooperative Extension Law, the Fish and Aquatic Life Code, and the Unemployment Insurance Act making conforming changes.
Title
AQUACULTURE DEVELOPMENT ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 099-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 205 | 205-60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 215 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
415 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 45 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 5 | 3.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-15.4-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |