IL HB3697 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-29 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-29 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that nothing in the Act limits, prevents, or preempts a recovery by an employee under the Biometric Information Privacy Act.
Title
WRK COMP BIOMETRIC NOT PREEMPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-041-002 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-002 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |