IL HB3848 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Decreases the appropriations made to the Office of the State Treasurer from the General Revenue Fund for contractual services, commodities, printing, equipment, and telecommunications services. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
$TREASURER-SUPPLEMENTAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Appropriations II |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-10-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2011-10-26 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-10-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-10-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney |
2011-10-19 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2011-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2011-10-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-10-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole |