IL HB3907 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Boards and Chicago School District Articles of the School Code. Provides that school boards shall allow all educators to have daily continuous uninterrupted individual classroom planning time. Provides that the planning period shall be equal to one class period but no less than 45 minutes in duration. Provides that this time requirement applies to educators who are in contact with students for 50% or more of their contracted workday. Provides that, during this planning period, educators may not be forced to substitute in other areas of the building or district when another educator is absent or a vacancy exists and may not be forced to attend meetings, trainings, or conferences of any kind. Provides that if an educator chooses to substitute or attend a meeting, training, or conference during their guaranteed planning period of their own free will, the educator shall be compensated at a rate of pay that is negotiated between the local Board of Education and local association of a state teacher association.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER PLAN TIME
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |