IL HB3953 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Cannabis Banking and Credit Union Act. Establishes a procedure to license financial institutions to provide banking services to cannabis businesses. Sets forth provisions concerning an advisory board, application and licensure, authorizations, deposit insurance, banking services, prohibited practices, and operative conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
BANK AND CREDIT UNION-CANNABIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3953&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3953.htm |