IL HB3955 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Automatic Contract Renewal Act. Provides that a consumer who accepts an automatic renewal or continuous service offer online shall be allowed to terminate the automatic renewal or continuous service exclusively online. Requires a business that makes an automatic renewal offer or continuous service offer online to provide a toll-free telephone number, electronic mail address, a postal address if the seller directly bills the consumer, or another cost-effective, timely, and easy-to-use mechanism for cancellation.
Title
AUTOMATIC RENEWAL CANCL ONLINE
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Eva Dina Delgado [D] |
Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0517 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 098-000-001 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 601 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |