IL HB3972 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0312
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0312
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. With respect to absentee ballots, provides that those returned by mail must be postmarked by midnight preceding election day, for counting no later than during the period for counting provisional ballots.
Title
ABSENTEE BALLOT POSTMARK
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0312 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Elections; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Elections | |
2009-04-23 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Elections | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |