IL HB4289 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that no property belonging to a public utility providing water or sewer service subject to the jurisdiction of the Illinois Commerce Commission may be taken or damaged by eminent domain without prior approval of the Illinois Commerce Commission. Excludes eminent domain actions commenced prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
ICC APPROVAL OF EMINENT DOMAIN
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-124-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-139-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 30 | 10-5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 7-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4289&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4289.htm |