IL HB4396 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the amount paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year for the purpose of purchasing acoustical materials, other materials, labor, and professional services to soundproof a residential home against aircraft noise generated by an airport governed by the provisions of the Permanent Noise Monitoring Act. Provides that the credit may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero; however, the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-SOUNDPROOFING
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-02-24 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-01-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4396&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4396.htm |