IL HB4396 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Director of Juvenile Justice and the Director of Corrections shall make quarterly reports to the Governor and the General Assembly concerning each incident of assault by a committed person toward Department of Juvenile Justice or Department of Corrections staff. Provides that these reports shall specify the facility where the incident occurred, the classification of offender that committed the assault, and the nature of the injury to the staff member, if any. Provides that the Director of Juvenile Justice and the Director of Corrections shall make quarterly reports to the Governor and the General Assembly concerning the use of force incidents administered by Department staff on persons committed to the Department. Provides that the reports shall specify the facility where the incident occurred, the classification of the offender that was the recipient of the use of force, and the nature of the injury, if any.
Title
CD CORR-REPORTS-ASSAULTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |