IL HB4660 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall give notice at least 60 days (instead of 120 days) before the expiration date of a certificate of registration if the certificate of registration will not be renewed because the taxpayer is in default for delinquent returns or for moneys due under any State tax law or municipal or county ordinance administered or enforced by the Department of Revenue.
Title
ROTA-REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Sen. John Cullerton [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-039-000 |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-02-20 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |