IL HB5621 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that as a prerequisite to receiving a high school diploma, each pupil entering the 9th grade in the 2015-2016 school year or a subsequent school year must successfully complete (i) 4 (instead of 3) years of mathematics, which may include math-intensive courses outside of traditional mathematics courses (instead of one of which must be Algebra I and one of which must include geometry content), and (ii) 3 (instead of 2) years of science, one of which must be a laboratory science. Provides that, when applicable, math-intensive courses may be counted towards the fulfillment of other graduation requirements.
Title
SCH CD-HIGH SCH COURSE REQ
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |