IL HB5621 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an insurer may not remove a provider from its provider directory until the last day of the end date of the original contract between the insurer and the provider.
Title
INS CD-PROVIDER DIRECTORY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 |
2016-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |