IL HB5798 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Full and Fair Noneconomic Damages Act. Provides that, in determining noneconomic damages, the fact finder may not consider: evidence of a defendant's alleged wrongdoing, misconduct, or guilt; evidence of the defendant's wealth or financial resources; or any other evidence that is offered for the purpose of punishing the defendant, rather than offered for a compensatory purpose. Provides for bifurcated trials before the same jury in cases involving punitive damages, if requested by any defendant. Outlines the procedure for the bifurcated trials. Provides for court review of noneconomic damage awards. Contains applicability provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
FULL FAIR NONECONOMIC DAMAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-06-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-05-25 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 068-048-000 | |
2010-05-25 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-05-25 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5798&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5798.htm |