IL SB0075 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0052
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0052
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Illinois Vehicle Code setting forth the school safety purposes for which surcharges imposed for certain violations of the special school zone speed limit may be used by school districts. Provides that those purposes include the Safe Routes to School Program and safety programs within the School Safety and Educational Improvement Block Grant Program (in addition to the existing purposes of school zone safety education and the purchase, installation, and maintenance of caution lights mounted on school speed zone signs). Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL ZONES-SURCHARGES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0052 | |
2009-07-23 | Effective Date July 23, 2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Governor Approved | |
2009-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-04-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-002 | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass Transportation; 010-000-000 | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond |