IL SB0155 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that a licensed barber is required to wear disposable gloves when shaving any part of a person's face, neck, or hairline. Effective immediately.
Title
BARBER ACT-SHAVING SANITATION
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Forby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Licensed Activities |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2011 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2011 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 010-000-000 |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |