IL SB0556 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Authority Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2012 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 210 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |