IL SB0556 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Lead Service Line Replacement and Notification Act. Creates the Lead Service Line Replacement Fund to be used to finance and administer programs and activities specified under the Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall be responsible for the administration of the Fund and shall allocate moneys on the basis of priorities established by the Agency. Makes a conforming change in the State Finance Act. Requires a lead in drinking water protection fee to be imposed on billed water usage in specified amounts to be collected by all community water supplies. Requires the owner or operator of each community water supply to perform specified activities. Creates the Lead Service Line Replacement Advisory Board within the Agency to perform specified duties. Contains other provisions. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to establish a comprehensive low-income water assistance policy and program with specified requirements. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may allow or direct a water utility to establish a customer assistance program that provides financial relief to residential customers who qualify for income-related assistance. Makes other changes. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires specified entities to provide to the Environmental Protection Agency by December 31, 2023, and again by December 31, 2025, specified information as it relates to the cost of providing water service. Provides that the Agency shall publish the information on the Agency's website. Provides that the Agency may adopt rules setting forth the general requirements for submittal of the information. Repeals the provisions regarding the information on January 1, 2026. Repeals a Section regarding lead in drinking water notifications and inventories.
Title
LEAD SERVICE LINE REPLACEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Special Issues |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-870 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 8-306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 17.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 17.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=556&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0556.htm |