IL SB0561 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the PFAS Reduction Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2022, a person, local government, fire department, or State agency may not discharge or otherwise use for training or testing purposes a class B firefighting foam containing intentionally added PFAS. On and after January 1, 2025, prohibits the knowing manufacture, sale, offering for sale, distribution for sale, or distribution for use of a class B firefighting foam containing intentionally added PFAS. Specifies exemptions to the Act. Provides specified notice and recall requirements for manufacturers. Specifies reporting requirements after the discharge, use, or release of class B firefighting foam containing intentionally added PFAS. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to administer and enforce the Act and to adopt rules. Requires the Office of the State Fire Marshal to conduct a survey of fire departments and to provide a report of the results of the survey to the General Assembly no later than 90 days after its completion. Specifies notice requirements for a manufacturer or person who sells firefighting personal protective equipment to any person, fire department, local government, or State agency if the firefighting personal protective equipment contains intentionally added PFAS. Contains a prohibition and exemption for the manufacture, sale, offering for sale, or distribution for sale of food packaging containing intentionally added PFAS. Creates the PFAS Program Fund and provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Agency as provided by rules adopted by the Agency. Provides a civil penalty for a manufacturer or person who violates the Act of $5,000 for the first violation of the Act and $10,000 for each subsequent violation. Provides that civil penalties collected must be deposited into the Environmental Protection Trust Fund to be used in accordance with the provisions of the Environmental Protection Trust Fund Act. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
PFAS REDUCTION
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0290 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Ellman |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |