IL SB0582 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, to ensure full access to the benefits set forth in provisions regarding the Healthy Kids Program, on and after January 1, 2022, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall ensure that provider and hospital reimbursements for immunization as required under the provisions are no lower than the Medicare reimbursement rate. Amends the Immunization Data Registry Act. Provides that health care providers, physician's designees, or pharmacist's designees shall (rather than may) provide immunization data to be entered into the immunization data registry. Removes language providing that the immunization data need not be provided if the patient or the patient's parent or guardian, if the patient is less than 18 years of age, has completed and filed with the provider, physician's designee, or pharmacist's designee a written immunization data exemption form. Provides that the written information and the immunization data exemption forms must include information that the health care provider shall (rather than may) report immunization data to the Department of Public Health to be entered into the immunization data registry. Removes language requiring the Department to distribute to health care providers, upon request, specified written information. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
IMMUNIZATIONS-DATA REGISTRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Health |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Health; Subcommittee on Medicaid |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Medicaid |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 527 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |