IL SB0600 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prescription Drug Repository Program Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to, by rule, establish a prescription drug repository program, under which a donor may donate a prescription drug or supplies needed to administer a prescription drug for use by an individual who meets eligibility criteria specified by the Department. Sets forth requirements that prescription drugs or supplies must meet in order to be accepted and dispensed under the program. Provides that uninsured and underinsured individuals shall be given priority over other eligible persons for drugs and supplies donated under the Act. Provides that no drugs or supplies donated under the prescription drug repository program may be resold. Provides that nothing in the Act requires that a pharmacy or pharmacist participate in the prescription drug repository program. Provides for civil and criminal immunity for drug and supply manufacturers and individuals in relation to the donation, acceptance, or dispensing of prescription drugs or supplies under the prescription drug repository program. Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Contains other provisions. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act, the Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act, the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Act, the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act, and the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tort Claims Act to provide that persons engaged in donating or accepting, or packaging, repackaging, or labeling, prescription drugs to the extent permitted or required under the Prescription Drug Repository Program Act are exempt from provisions of those other Acts that might prohibit or otherwise regulate such activity.
Title
PRESCRIPTION DRUG REPOSITORY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Health |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 120 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 50 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 620 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=600&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0600.htm |