IL SB1948 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law; Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |