IL SB2586 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if Senate Bill 26 of the 98th General Assembly becomes law, amends: the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013 by making various changes concerning the composition and duties of and support to the working group created by the Act; and the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code by providing that the creation of comparable programs for the services contained in the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013 for community-based providers by the Division of Mental Health of the Department of Human Services shall be in concert with the Division of Alcohol and Substance Abuse of the Department of Human Services and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Effective immediately.
Title
MENTAL HLTH SYSTEM PLANNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0878 |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date August 11, 2014 |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-04-24 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2014-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-04-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-04-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Steans |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Human Services |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Human Services |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 005-000-000 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 6-104.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |