IL SB2917 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Epinephrine Auto-Injector Act. Provides that when an employee or agent of an authorized entity or other individual who has completed specified anaphylaxis training administers an epinephrine auto-injector in good faith, the authorized agency, and its employees and agents, including a physician, physician's assistant with prescriptive authority, or advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority who provides a standing order or prescription for an epinephrine auto-injector, incur no civil or professional liability, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury or death arising from the use of an epinephrine auto-injector. Provides that a health care professional shall not be subject to civil or professional liability for not providing an epinephrine auto-injector standing order or prescription.
Title
EPINEPHRINE AUTO-INJECTOR
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 27 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |