IL SB2917 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for bringing contraband into a penal institution committed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall receive no more than 4.5 days of sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a prisoner serving a sentence for bringing contraband into a penal institution shall receive no additional sentence credit under the Code.
Title
CD CORR-CONTRABAND PENAL INST
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2917&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2917.htm |