IL SB2929 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Specifically includes the Procurement of Domestic Products Act as one of the laws (and related administrative requirements) that apply to the Public Community College Act. Removes a reference to the Public Works Preference Act, which has been repealed. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL ACT-DOMESTIC PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1105 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2012 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-004-000 |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 007-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education |
2012-05-18 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-18 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2012 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-035-001 |
2012-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Procurement; 009-000-000 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Held in Procurement |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Procurement |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |